Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB18 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger, et al. S.B. No. 18
 (In the Senate - Filed January 19, 2017; January 24, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 February 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 4, Nays 2, 1 present not voting; February 22, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eliminating provisions requiring public institutions
 of higher education to set aside portions of designated tuition for
 student financial assistance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 56, Education Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply
 beginning with tuition charged for the 2018 spring semester.
 Tuition charged for any semester or other academic term before the
 2018 spring semester is covered by the applicable law as it existed
 before the effective date of this Act, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *