Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1812 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/25/2017

                    By: Taylor of Collin S.B. No. 1812
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 25, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 2; April 25, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of an appraisal district to use public
 money for lobbying activity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 305.026, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section,
 an appraisal district may not use public money to directly or
 indirectly influence or attempt to influence the passage or defeat
 of any legislation pending before the legislature. This subsection
 does not prevent an appraisal district employee from providing
 information for a member of the legislature or appearing before a
 legislative committee at the request of the committee or the member
 of the legislature.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *