Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1824 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/26/2017

                    By: Burton S.B. No. 1824
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 26, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 26, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to punishment for the offense of forgery and to a fee
 imposed on certain defendants who commit the offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 32.21, Penal Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (d), (e), and (e-1) and adding Subsections
 (e-2) and (g) to read as follows:
 (d)  Subject to Subsection (e-1), an [An] offense under this
 section is a state jail felony if the writing is or purports to be a
 will, codicil, deed, deed of trust, mortgage, security instrument,
 security agreement, credit card, check, authorization to debit an
 account at a financial institution, or similar sight order for
 payment of money, contract, release, or other commercial
 instrument.
 (e)  Subject to Subsection (e-1), an [An] offense under this
 section is a felony of the third degree if the writing is or
 purports to be:
 (1)  part of an issue of money, securities, postage or
 revenue stamps;
 (2)  a government record listed in Section 37.01(2)(C);
 or
 (3)  other instruments issued by a state or national
 government or by a subdivision of either, or part of an issue of
 stock, bonds, or other instruments representing interests in or
 claims against another person.
 (e-1)  If it is shown on the trial of an offense under this
 section that the actor engaged in the conduct to obtain or attempt
 to obtain a property or service, an offense under this section is:
 (1)  a Class C misdemeanor if the value of the property
 or service is less than $100;
 (2)  a Class B misdemeanor if the value of the property
 or service is $100 or more but less than $750;
 (3)  a Class A misdemeanor if the value of the property
 or service is $750 or more but less than $2,500;
 (4)  a state jail felony if the value of the property or
 service is $2,500 or more but less than $30,000;
 (5)  a felony of the third degree if the value of the
 property or service is $30,000 or more but less than $150,000;
 (6)  a felony of the second degree if the value of the
 property or service is $150,000 or more but less than $300,000; and
 (7)  a felony of the first degree if the value of the
 property or service is $300,000 or more.
 (e-2)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section,
 an [An] offense under this section, other than an offense described
 for purposes of punishment by Subsection (e-1)(7), is increased to
 the next higher category of offense if it is shown on the trial of
 the offense that the offense was committed against an elderly
 individual as defined by Section 22.04.
 (g)  If conduct that constitutes an offense under this
 section also constitutes an offense under any other law, the actor
 may be prosecuted under this section or the other law.
 SECTION 2.  Article 102.0071, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 102.0071.  JUSTICE COURT DISHONORED CHECK OR SIMILAR
 SIGHT ORDER.  On conviction in justice court of an offense under
 Section 32.41, Penal Code, or an offense under Section 31.03, [or]
 31.04, or 32.21, Penal Code, in which it is shown that the defendant
 committed the offense by issuing, [or] passing, or forging a check
 or similar sight order, as defined by Section 1.07, Penal Code, that
 was subsequently dishonored, the court may collect from the
 defendant and pay to the holder of the check or order the fee
 permitted by Section 3.506, Business & Commerce Code.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *