By: Buckingham S.B. No. 1831 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2017; March 23, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 26, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 13, Nays 0; April 26, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1831 By: Hinojosa A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to an annual report on state programs not funded by appropriations. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 403, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 403.0147 to read as follows: Sec. 403.0147. REPORT ON STATE PROGRAMS NOT FUNDED BY APPROPRIATIONS. (a) In this section, "state agency" means an agency, department, board, commission, or other entity in the executive, legislative, or judicial branch of state government. (b) Not later than December 31 of each year, the comptroller shall submit a report to the legislature that identifies for each state agency: (1) each program the state agency is statutorily required to implement for which no appropriation was made for the preceding state fiscal year, along with a citation to the law imposing the requirement; and (2) the amount and source of money the state agency spent, if any, to implement any portion of the program described by Subdivision (1) during the preceding state fiscal year. (c) A state agency shall provide to the comptroller not later than September 30 of each year information necessary for the comptroller to prepare the report required by this section. The comptroller may prescribe the form and content of the information a state agency must provide. SECTION 2. The comptroller of public accounts shall submit the initial report required by Section 403.0147, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than December 31, 2017. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *