Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1837 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/18/2017

                    By: Hughes, Nichols S.B. No. 1837
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 18, 2017,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1837 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to financial accountability standards for charter schools
 operated by a public institution of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.082, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e-1) to read as follows:
 (e-1)  The financial performance of a charter school
 operated by a public institution of higher education under
 Subchapter D or E, Chapter 12, shall be evaluated using only the
 indicators adopted under this section determined by the
 commissioner by rule as appropriate to accurately measure the
 financial performance of such charter schools.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *