Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1854 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2017

                    By: Uresti S.B. No. 1854
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 24, 2017,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0, 1 present not voting;
 April 24, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1854 By:  Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring the review of public school district
 paperwork to limit paperwork requirements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.164, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Not less than once every six months, each
 district-level committee established under Section 11.251 shall
 review paperwork requirements imposed on classroom teachers and
 shall make recommendations to the board of trustees of the school
 district regarding the transfer to existing noninstructional staff
 of a reporting task that can reasonably be accomplished by that
 staff as authorized by Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *