Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1857 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/10/2017

                    By: Whitmire S.B. No. 1857
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 10, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 10, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1857 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exchange of certain information between the
 Department of Family and Protective Services or certain foster care
 services contractors and a state or local juvenile justice agency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 58.0052, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Juvenile justice agency" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 58.101.
 (2)  "Juvenile service provider" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 58.0051.
 (3) [(2)]  "Multi-system youth" means a person who:
 (A)  is younger than 19 years of age; and
 (B)  has received services from two or more
 juvenile service providers.
 (4) [(3)]  "Personal health information" means
 personally identifiable information regarding a multi-system
 youth's physical or mental health or the provision of or payment for
 health care services, including case management services, to a
 multi-system youth.  The term does not include clinical
 psychological notes or substance abuse treatment information.
 (b-1)  At the request of a state or local juvenile justice
 agency, the Department of Family and Protective Services or a
 single source continuum contractor who contracts with the
 department to provide foster care services shall, not later than
 the 14th business day after the date of the request, share with the
 juvenile justice agency information in the possession of the
 department or contractor that assists the agency in the
 continuation of services for or providing services to a
 multi-system youth who:
 (1)  is or has been in the temporary or permanent
 managing conservatorship of the department;
 (2)  is or was the subject of a family-based safety
 services case with the department;
 (3)  has been reported as an alleged victim of abuse or
 neglect to the department;
 (4)  is the perpetrator in a case in which the
 department investigation concluded that there was a reason to
 believe that abuse or neglect occurred; or
 (5)  is a victim in a case in which the department
 investigation concluded that there was a reason to believe that
 abuse or neglect occurred.
 (b-2)  At the request of the Department of Family and
 Protective Services or a single source continuum contractor who
 contracts with the department to provide foster care services, a
 state or local juvenile justice agency shall share with the
 department or contractor information in the possession of the
 juvenile justice agency that assists the department or contractor
 in the continuation of services for or providing services to a
 multi-system youth who is or has been in the custody or control of
 the juvenile justice agency.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *