Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1878 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/11/2017

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1878
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 11, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0, 1 present not voting; April 11, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the service plan for the annexation by certain
 municipalities of territory included in an emergency services
 district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 43.056(p), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (p)  This subsection applies only to a municipality in a
 county with a population of more than one million and less than 1.75
 [1.5] million.  For a municipality that has adopted Chapter 143 and
 directly employs firefighters, a service plan that includes the
 provision of services to an area that, at the time the service plan
 is adopted, is located in the territory of an emergency services
 district:
 (1)  must require the municipality's fire department to
 provide initial response to the annexed territory that is
 equivalent to that provided to other areas within the corporate
 boundaries of the municipality with similar topography, land use,
 and population density;
 (2)  may not provide for municipal fire services to the
 annexed area solely or primarily by means of an automatic aid or
 mutual aid agreement with the affected emergency services district
 or other third-party provider of services; and
 (3)  may authorize the emergency services district to
 provide supplemental fire and emergency medical services to the
 annexed area by means of an automatic aid or mutual aid agreement.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 43.056(p), Local Government Code, applies only to the annexation of
 an area for which all parts of the statutory annexation process are
 begun on or after the effective date of this Act. The annexation of
 an area for which any part of the statutory annexation process was
 begun before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law
 in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *