Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1883 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/01/2017

                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 1883
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 23, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 1, 2017,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 1; May 1, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1883 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the approval of open-enrollment charter schools and the
 review of challenges by open-enrollment charter schools or school
 districts to accountability determinations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.101(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  After thoroughly investigating and evaluating an
 applicant, the commissioner[, in coordination with a member of the
 State Board of Education designated for the purpose by the chair of
 the board,] may grant a charter for an open-enrollment charter
 school only to an applicant that meets any financial, governing,
 educational, and operational standards adopted by the commissioner
 under this subchapter, that the commissioner determines is capable
 of carrying out the responsibilities provided by the charter and
 likely to operate a school of high quality, and that:
 (1)  has not within the preceding 10 years had a charter
 under this chapter or a similar charter issued under the laws of
 another state surrendered under a settlement agreement, revoked,
 denied renewal, or returned; or
 (2)  is not, under rules adopted by the commissioner,
 considered to be a corporate affiliate of or substantially related
 to an entity that has within the preceding 10 years had a charter
 under this chapter or a similar charter issued under the laws of
 another state surrendered under a settlement agreement, revoked,
 denied renewal, or returned.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 12, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 12.1102 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.1102.  APPEAL OF APPLICATION SELECTION
 DETERMINATION. (a)  This section applies only if the charter
 application selection process includes:
 (1)  scoring criteria and procedures for use of the
 criteria by an external application review panel selected by the
 commissioner; and
 (2)  selection criteria that include the minimum score
 necessary for an applicant to be eligible for selection.
 (b)  The commissioner shall adopt procedures for the appeal
 of an application selection determination made based on the
 submission of an application under a process described by
 Subsection (a).
 (c)  The procedures adopted under this section must provide
 for an applicant who scores within 10 percentage points of the
 minimum score necessary for an applicant to be eligible for
 selection to appeal to the commissioner a score determined by the
 external application review panel.
 (d)  The commissioner's determination in an appeal under the
 procedures adopted under this section is final.
 SECTION 3.  Section 12.1141, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d-1) to read as follows:
 (d-1)  The commissioner may not allow the charter of an
 open-enrollment charter school to expire as provided by Subsection
 (d) if for one of the school years the commissioner considers in
 making a decision the school is not rated as provided by Section
 39.151(c-1).
 SECTION 4.  Section 12.115, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  The commissioner may not revoke the charter of an
 open-enrollment charter school as provided by Subsection (c) if for
 one of the school years the commissioner considers in making a
 decision the school is not rated as provided by Section
 39.151(c-1).
 SECTION 5.  Section 39.151, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c-1) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  The rules under Subsection (a) must provide for the
 commissioner to appoint a committee to make recommendations to the
 commissioner on a challenge made to an agency decision relating to
 an academic performance rating or determination or financial
 accountability rating. The committee shall review any challenge
 regardless of the basis identified in the challenge by the school
 district or open-enrollment charter school for the rating or
 determination. The commissioner may not appoint an agency employee
 as a member of a [the] committee.
 (c-1)  Except as provided by this subsection, the
 commissioner may not limit a challenge relating to a data or
 calculation error or inaccuracy attributable to the school district
 or open-enrollment charter school, even if the challenge
 demonstrates that the data or calculation error or inaccuracy
 caused the district or school to have a lower academic performance
 rating or financial accountability rating. To consider a challenge
 under this subsection, supporting documentation related to a data
 or calculation error or inaccuracy must be submitted not later than
 the first anniversary of the date of the deadline to submit a
 challenge.  If a challenge demonstrates that the data or
 calculation error or inaccuracy caused the district or school to
 have a lower academic performance rating or financial
 accountability rating, the commissioner shall:
 (1)  assign the district or school the corrected
 rating; or
 (2)  indicate for that school year that the district or
 school is not rated.
 SECTION 6.  Section 12.101(b-0), Education Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 7.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the commissioner of education shall adopt procedures
 for the appeal of an application selection determination as
 provided by Section 12.1102, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 8.  Section 12.1102, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to an application submitted on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 9.  Section 39.151(c-1), Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a data or calculation error or inaccuracy
 challenge to an academic performance rating or financial
 accountability rating assigned for the 2017-2018 school year or a
 later school year.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect immediately if it
 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate
 effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *