Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB190 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/25/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 190


 AN ACT
 relating to the administrative closure of certain reported cases of
 child abuse or neglect made to the Department of Family and
 Protective Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 261, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 261.3017 to read as follows:
 Sec. 261.3017.  ABBREVIATED INVESTIGATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE
 CLOSURE OF CERTAIN CASES.  (a)  A department caseworker may refer a
 reported case of child abuse or neglect to a department supervisor
 for abbreviated investigation or administrative closure at any time
 before the 60th day after the date the report is received if:
 (1)  there is no prior report of abuse or neglect of the
 child who is the subject of the report;
 (2)  the department has not received an additional
 report of abuse or neglect of the child following the initial
 report;
 (3)  after contacting a professional or other credible
 source, the caseworker determines that the child's safety can be
 assured without further investigation, response, services, or
 assistance; and
 (4)  the caseworker determines that no abuse or neglect
 occurred.
 (b)  A department supervisor shall review each reported case
 of child abuse or neglect that has remained open for more than 60
 days and administratively close the case if:
 (1)  the supervisor determines that:
 (A)  the circumstances described by Subsections
 (a)(1)-(4) exist; and
 (B)  closing the case would not expose the child
 to an undue risk of harm; and
 (2)  the department director grants approval for the
 administrative closure of the case.
 (c)  A department supervisor may reassign a reported case of
 child abuse or neglect that does not qualify for abbreviated
 investigation or administrative closure under Subsection (a) or (b)
 to a different department caseworker if the supervisor determines
 that reassignment would allow the department to make the most
 effective use of resources to investigate and respond to reported
 cases of abuse or neglect.
 (d)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules necessary
 to implement this section.
 (e)  In this section, "professional" means an individual who
 is licensed or certified by the state or who is an employee of a
 facility licensed, certified, or operated by the state and who, in
 the normal course of official duties or duties for which a license
 or certification is required, has direct contact with children.
 The term includes teachers, nurses, doctors, day-care employees,
 employees of a clinic or health care facility that provides
 reproductive services, juvenile probation officers, and juvenile
 detention or correctional officers.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2017, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt the rules necessary to implement Section 261.3017, Family
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 190 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 190 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor