Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1929 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2017

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 1929
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 27, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 24, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1929 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to maternal mortality and morbidity and pregnancy-related
 deaths, including postpartum depression.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 34.005, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 34.005.  DUTIES OF TASK FORCE.  The task force shall:
 (1)  study and review:
 (A)  cases of  pregnancy-related deaths; and
 (B)  trends, rates, or disparities in maternal
 mortality and in severe maternal morbidity;
 (2)  determine the feasibility of the task force
 studying cases of severe maternal morbidity; and
 (3)  make recommendations to help reduce the incidence
 of pregnancy-related deaths and severe maternal morbidity in this
 state.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 34.007(a) and (b), Health and Safety
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The department shall determine a statistically
 significant number of cases of pregnancy-related deaths for
 review.  The department shall either randomly select cases or
 select all cases for the task force to review under this subsection
 to reflect a cross-section of pregnancy-related deaths in this
 state.
 (b)  The department shall statistically analyze aggregate
 data of pregnancy-related deaths and severe maternal morbidity in
 this state to identify any trends, rates, or disparities.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 34, Health and Safety Code, is amended by
 adding Section 34.0155 to read as follows:
 Sec. 34.0155.  REPORT ON MATERNAL MORTALITY AND
 PREGNANCY-RELATED DEATHS. The commission shall:
 (1)  evaluate options for reducing maternal mortality,
 focusing on the most prevalent causes of maternal mortality as
 identified in the task force's biennial report required under
 Section 34.015, and for treating postpartum depression in
 economically disadvantaged women;
 (2)  submit a written report that summarizes the
 commission's efforts to accomplish the tasks described by
 Subdivision (1) to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, the Legislative Budget
 Board, and the appropriate standing committees of the legislature
 not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year; and
 (3)  to the extent authorized by state and federal law,
 apply for federal money to fund the screening and treatment of
 postpartum depression under Section 10005 of the 21st Century Cures
 Act (42 U.S.C. Section 201 et seq.) and consider the
 recommendations contained in the task force's biennial report in
 using any federal grant money received.
 SECTION 4.  Section 34.018, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 34.018.  SUNSET PROVISION. The task force is subject to
 Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued
 in existence as provided by that chapter, the task force is
 abolished and this chapter expires December 31, 2023 [September 1,
 2019].
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *