Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB196 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 196


 relating to a notification requirement if a public school,
 including an open-enrollment charter school, does not have a nurse,
 school counselor, or librarian assigned to the school during all
 instructional hours.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 25, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 25.097 to read as follows:
 Sec. 25.097.  PARENTAL NOTIFICATION CONCERNING NURSES,
 SCHOOL COUNSELORS, AND LIBRARIANS. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Librarian" means a person certified as a
 librarian under Subchapter B, Chapter 21.
 (2)  "Nurse" means a person licensed under Chapter 301,
 Occupations Code.
 (3)  "School counselor" means a person certified as a
 school counselor under Subchapter B, Chapter 21.
 (b)  Except as otherwise provided by Subsection (i), a public
 school, including an open-enrollment charter school, that does not
 have a full-time nurse, school counselor, or librarian or the
 equivalent of a full-time nurse, school counselor, or librarian
 assigned to be present at the school for more than 30 consecutive
 instructional days during the same school year shall provide
 written notice of the absence to the parent of or other person
 standing in parental relation to each student enrolled in the
 school.
 (c)  A school has the equivalent of a full-time nurse under
 Subsection (b) if the school has two or more nurses assigned to the
 school and all regular student instructional hours at the campus
 during the regular school day are covered by the assignment of at
 least one nurse.
 (d)  A school has the equivalent of a full-time school
 counselor under Subsection (b) if the school has two or more school
 counselors assigned to the school and all regular student
 instructional hours at the campus during the regular school day are
 covered by the assignment of at least one school counselor.
 (e)  A school has the equivalent of a full-time librarian
 under Subsection (b) if the school has two or more librarians
 assigned to the school and all regular student instructional hours
 at the campus during the regular school day are covered by the
 assignment of at least one librarian.
 (f)  The principal of the school shall provide the notice
 required by Subsection (b) not later than the 30th instructional
 day after the first day the school does not have a full-time nurse,
 school counselor, or librarian assigned to be present at the
 school.
 (g)  The school shall:
 (1)  make a good faith effort to ensure that the notice
 required by this section is provided in a bilingual form to any
 parent or other person standing in parental relation whose primary
 language is not English; and
 (2)  retain a copy of any notice provided under this
 section.
 (h)  A school may satisfy the notice requirement under
 Subsection (f) by posting the notice on the school's Internet
 website.  Notice posted under this subsection must be accessible
 from the home page of the Internet website by use of not more than
 three links.
 (i)  This section does not apply to a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school with a student enrollment of less
 than 10,000 students.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 196 passed the Senate on
 May 2, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 19, Nays 12; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 26, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 19, Nays 12.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 196 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 80,
 Nays 63, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor