Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1964 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/05/2017

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 1964
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 27, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 May 5, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 5, 2017, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1964 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of land in the William Goodrich Jones State
 Forest.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 88, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 88.1085 to read as follows:
 Sec. 88.1085.  USE OF LAND IN WILLIAM GOODRICH JONES STATE
 FOREST. (a)  For the purpose of this section, the "Jones State
 Forest" means the real property owned by the state for the use and
 benefit of The Texas A&M University System to demonstrate
 reforestation work under the Texas A&M Forest Service, consisting
 of approximately 1,733 acres in Montgomery County, and formally
 dedicated and named the William Goodrich Jones State Forest.
 (b)  The entire territory of the Jones State Forest must
 remain natural, scenic, undeveloped, and open. No statute, rule,
 policy, or ordinance may be enforced with respect to the territory
 of the Jones State Forest, other than a statute, rule, policy, or
 ordinance that protects and preserves the natural resources, air
 quality, or water quality of the Jones State Forest.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *