Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1980 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2017

                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 1980
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 27, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 May 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0, 1 present not voting; May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to performance bonds for certain public improvements in
 certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 212.073, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 212.073.  PERFORMANCE BOND; LETTER OF CREDIT.
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), the [The] developer must
 execute a performance bond for the construction of the improvements
 that are the subject of the contract under Section 212.071 to ensure
 completion of the project. The bond must be executed by a corporate
 surety in accordance with Chapter 2253, Government Code. The
 amount of the bond must be for the contract price for the
 improvements. The municipality may not require the developer to
 include in the amount of the bond any other improvement related to
 the development that the developer did not contract with the
 municipality to construct under Section 212.071.
 (b)  The municipality and developer may agree that, instead
 of a performance bond under Subsection (a), the developer may
 submit to the municipality an irrevocable letter of credit in the
 amount required under Subsection (a) for the bond. As part of the
 agreement, the municipality may not pay any amount to the
 developer, issue a building permit related to the development other
 than a permit necessary for the improvements that are the subject of
 the contract, or approve a subdivision plat for the developer
 until:
 (1)  the improvements are:
 (A)  complete; or
 (B)  in the final phase of construction if the
 improvements are constructed in phases; and
 (2)  the developer has submitted to the municipality an
 affidavit stating that the developer has paid all costs associated
 with the construction.
 SECTION 2.  Section 212.073, Local Government Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to a contract entered into under
 Section 212.071, Local Government Code, on or after the effective
 date of this Act. A contract entered into under Section 212.071,
 Local Government Code, before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law applicable to the contract immediately before
 the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *