Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1987 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/05/2017

                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 1987
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 27, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 5, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0,
 1 present not voting; April 5, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1987 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the notice requirements for bills proposing the
 creation of or annexation of land to certain special purpose
 districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 313.006, Government Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 313.006.  NOTICE FOR LAWS ESTABLISHING OR ADDING
 TERRITORY TO MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICTS.
 SECTION 2.  Section 313.006, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (d) and adding Subsections (e)
 and (f) to read as follows:
 (a)  In addition to the other requirements of this chapter, a
 person, other than a member of the legislature, who intends to apply
 for the passage of a law establishing or adding territory to a
 special district that incorporates a power from Chapter 375, Local
 Government Code, must provide notice as provided by this section.
 (b)  The person shall notify by mail each person who owns
 real property [in the] proposed to be included in a new district or
 to be added to an existing district, according to the most recent
 certified tax appraisal roll for the county in which the real
 property is owned.  The notice, properly addressed with postage
 paid, must be deposited with the United States Postal Service not
 later than the 30th day before the date on which the intended law is
 introduced in the legislature.
 (d)  The person is not required to mail notice under
 Subsection (b) or (e) to a person who owns real property in the
 proposed district or in the area proposed to be added to a district
 if the property cannot be subject to an assessment by the district.
 (e)  After the introduction of a law in the legislature
 establishing or adding territory to a special district that
 incorporates a power from Chapter 375, Local Government Code, the
 person shall mail to each person who owns real property proposed to
 be included in a new district or to be added to an existing district
 a notice that the legislation has been introduced, including the
 applicable bill number. The notice, properly addressed with
 postage paid, must be deposited with the United States Postal
 Service not later than the 30th day after the date on which the
 intended law is introduced in the legislature. If the person has
 not mailed the notice required under this subsection on the 31st day
 after the date on which the intended law is introduced in the
 legislature, the person may cure the deficiency by immediately
 mailing the notice, but the person shall in no event mail the notice
 later than the date on which the intended law is reported out of
 committee in the chamber other than the chamber in which the
 intended law was introduced. If similar bills are filed in both
 chambers of the legislature, a person is only required to provide a
 single notice under this subsection not later than the 30th day
 after the date the first of the bills is filed.
 (f)  A landowner may waive any notice required under this
 section at any time.
 SECTION 3.  Section 375.022(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The petition must be signed by[:
 [(1)]  the owners of a majority of the assessed value of
 the real property in the proposed district, according to the most
 recent certified county property tax rolls[; or
 [(2)     50 persons who own real property in the proposed
 district if, according to the most recent certified county property
 tax rolls, more than 50 persons own real property in the proposed
 district].
 SECTION 4.  Section 49.302(b), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A petition requesting the annexation of a defined area
 signed by a majority in value of the owners of land in the defined
 area, as shown by the tax rolls of the central appraisal district of
 the county or counties in which such area is located, [or signed by
 50 landowners if the number of landowners is more than 50,] shall
 describe the land by metes and bounds or by lot and block number if
 there is a recorded plat of the area and shall be filed with the
 secretary of the board.
 SECTION 5.  Section 54.014, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 54.014.  PETITION. When it is proposed to create a
 district, a petition requesting creation shall be filed with the
 commission. The petition shall be signed by a majority in value of
 the holders of title of the land within the proposed district, as
 indicated by the tax rolls of the central appraisal district. [If
 there are more than 50 persons holding title to the land in the
 proposed district, as indicated by the tax rolls of the central
 appraisal district, the petition is sufficient if it is signed by 50
 holders of title to the land.]
 SECTION 6.  Section 54.016(a), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  No land within the corporate limits of a city or within
 the extraterritorial jurisdiction of a city, shall be included in a
 district unless the city grants its written consent, by resolution
 or ordinance, to the inclusion of the land within the district in
 accordance with Section 42.042, Local Government Code, and this
 section. The request to a city for its written consent to the
 creation of a district, shall be signed by a majority in value of
 the holders of title of the land within the proposed district as
 indicated by the county tax rolls [or, if there are more than 50
 persons holding title to the land in the proposed district as
 indicated by the county tax rolls, the request to the city will be
 sufficient if it is signed by 50 holders of title to the land in the
 district]. A petition for the written consent of a city to the
 inclusion of land within a district shall describe the boundaries
 of the land to be included in the district by metes and bounds or by
 lot and block number, if there is a recorded map or plat and survey
 of the area, and state the general nature of the work proposed to be
 done, the necessity for the work, and the cost of the project as
 then estimated by those filing the petition. If, at the time a
 petition is filed with a city for creation of a district, the
 district proposes to connect to a city's water or sewer system or
 proposes to contract with a regional water and wastewater provider
 which has been designated as such by the commission as of the date
 such petition is filed, to which the city has made a capital
 contribution for the water and wastewater facilities serving the
 area, the proposed district shall be designated as a "city service
 district."  If such proposed district does not meet the criteria for
 a city service district at the time the petition seeking creation is
 filed, such district shall be designated as a "noncity service
 district."  The city's consent shall not place any restrictions or
 conditions on the creation of a noncity service district as defined
 by Chapter 54 of the Texas Water Code other than those expressly
 provided in Subsection (e) of this section and shall specifically
 not limit the amounts of the district's bonds. A city may not
 require annexation as a consent to creation of any district. A city
 shall not refuse to approve a district bond issue for any reason
 except that the district is not in compliance with valid consent
 requirements applicable to the district. If a city grants its
 written consent without the concurrence of the applicant to the
 creation of a noncity service district containing conditions or
 restrictions that the petitioning land owner or owners reasonably
 believe exceed the city's powers, such land owner or owners may
 petition the commission to create the district and to modify the
 conditions and restrictions of the city's consent. The commission
 may declare any provision of the consent to be null and void.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *