Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB202 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/14/2016

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    85R2454 KJE-D
 By: West S.B. No. 202


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to inclusion of instruction regarding interaction with
 peace officers in the required curriculum for ninth grade public
 school students and to civilian interaction training for peace
 officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.012 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.012.  INSTRUCTION ON INTERACTION WITH LAW
 ENFORCEMENT. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Board" means the State Board of Education.
 (2)  "Commission" means the Texas Commission on Law
 Enforcement.
 (b)  The board and the commission shall enter into a
 memorandum of understanding that establishes each agency's
 respective responsibilities in developing instruction on proper
 interaction with peace officers during traffic stops and other
 in-person encounters.
 (c)  The board and the commission may consult with any
 interested party in developing the instruction under this section.
 (d)  Before finalizing any instruction under this section,
 the board and the commission shall provide a reasonable period for
 public comment.
 SECTION 2.  Section 28.025, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-20) to read as follows:
 (b-20)  The State Board of Education shall adopt rules to
 include the instruction developed under Section 28.012 in the
 required curriculum for students in ninth grade.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1701.253, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (n) to read as follows:
 (n)  As part of the minimum curriculum requirements, the
 commission shall require an officer to complete the civilian
 interaction training program developed under Section 1701.268. An
 officer shall complete the program not later than the second
 anniversary of the date the officer is licensed under this chapter
 unless the officer completes the program as part of the officer's
 basic training course.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter F, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1701.268 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.268.  CIVILIAN INTERACTION TRAINING PROGRAM. (a)
 In this section, "board" means the State Board of Education.
 (b)  The commission and the board shall enter into a
 memorandum of understanding that establishes each agency's
 respective responsibilities in developing a training program on
 proper interaction with civilians during traffic stops and other
 in-person encounters.
 (c)  The commission and the board may consult with any
 interested party in developing the training program under this
 section.
 (d)  Before finalizing a training program under this
 section, the commission and the board shall provide a reasonable
 period for public comment.
 SECTION 5.  (a) Not later than September 1, 2018, the State
 Board of Education and the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement
 shall develop:
 (1)  the instruction required under Section 28.012,
 Education Code, as added by this Act; and
 (2)  the training program required under Section
 1701.268, Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Section 28.025(b-20), Education Code, as added by this
 Act, applies beginning with the 2018-2019 school year.
 (c)  A peace officer or reserve law enforcement officer who
 holds a license under Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, issued on or
 before January 1, 2018, shall complete a training program
 established under Section 1701.268, Occupations Code, as added by
 this Act, not later than January 1, 2020.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.