Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2020 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/18/2017

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 2020
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 27, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 18, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 18, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2020 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to voter information used for juror selections.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 62.001(a), (b), (c), (f), (g), and (h),
 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The jury wheel must be reconstituted by using, as the
 source:
 (1)  the names of all persons on the current statewide
 voter registration list maintained as required under Section
 18.061, Election Code, [lists] from all the precincts in the
 county; and
 (2)  all names on a current list to be furnished by the
 Department of Public Safety as required by Subsection (f), showing
 the residents [citizens] of the county who:
 (A)  hold a valid Texas driver's license or a
 valid personal identification card or certificate issued by the
 department; and
 (B)  are not disqualified from jury service under
 Section 62.102(1), (2), (3), or (8) [(7)].
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the following names [of
 persons listed on a register of persons exempt from jury service]
 may not be placed in the jury wheel:
 (1)  the names of persons listed on a registrar of
 persons exempt from jury service[,] as provided by Sections 62.108
 and 62.109; and
 (2)  the names of persons on the suspense list
 maintained by the voter registrar under Section 15.081, Election
 Code.
 (c)  Each year not later than the third Tuesday in November
 or the date provided by Section 16.032, Election Code, for the
 cancellation of voter registrations, whichever is earlier, the
 voter registrar of each county shall furnish to the secretary of
 state a list of people exempted from jury service under Subsection
 (b) [current voter registration list from all the precincts in the
 county that, except as provided by Subsection (d), includes:
 [(1)     the complete name, mailing address, date of
 birth, voter registration number, and precinct number for each
 voter;
 [(2)     if available, the Texas driver's license number
 or personal identification card or certificate number and social
 security number for each voter; and
 [(3)     any other information included on the voter
 registration list of the county].
 (f)  The Department of Public Safety shall furnish a list to
 the secretary of state that shows the names required under
 Subsection (a)(2) and that contains any [of the] information
 [enumerated in Subsection (c) that is] available to the department
 regarding a person's residential address, mailing address, date of
 birth, Texas driver's license number or personal identification
 card or certificate number, social security number, [including]
 citizenship status, and county of residence. The list shall
 exclude the names of convicted felons, persons who are not citizens
 of the United States, persons residing outside the county, and the
 duplicate name of any registrant. The department shall furnish the
 list to the secretary of state on or before the first Monday in
 October of each year.
 (g)  The secretary of state shall accept the lists furnished
 as provided by Subsections (c) and [(c) through] (f). The secretary
 of state shall combine the list furnished under Subsection (f) with
 the information on the statewide voter registration list maintained
 by the voter registrar as required under Section 18.061, Election
 Code, eliminate duplicate names and names of exempt persons on the
 list provided to the secretary of state under Subsection (c)
 [lists, eliminate duplicate names], and send the combined list to
 each county on or before December 31 of each year or as may be
 required under a plan developed in accordance with Section 62.011.
 The district clerk or bailiff designated as the officer in charge of
 the jury selection process for a county that has adopted a plan
 under Section 62.011 shall give the secretary of state notice not
 later than the 90th day before the date the list is required. The
 list furnished the county [must be in a format, electronic or
 printed copy, as requested by the county and] must be certified by
 the secretary of state stating that the list contains the names
 required by Subsection (a) and excludes the names of exempt persons
 provided to the secretary of state under Subsection [Subsections
 (c) through] (f), eliminating duplications. The secretary of state
 shall furnish the electronic list free of charge.
 (h)  If the secretary of state is unable to furnish the list
 as provided in this section because of the failure of the voter
 registrar to furnish the information necessary to maintain the
 statewide voter registration list as required under Section 18.061,
 Election Code [county voter registration list to the secretary of
 state], the county tax assessor-collector, sheriff, county clerk,
 and district clerk in the county shall meet at the county courthouse
 between January 1 and January 15 of the following year and shall
 reconstitute the jury wheel for the county, except as provided
 under a plan adopted under Section 62.011.  The deadlines included
 in the plan control for preparing the list and reconstituting the
 wheel. The secretary of state shall send the list furnished by the
 Department of Public Safety as provided by Subsection (f) to the
 voter registrar, who shall combine the lists as described in this
 section for use as the juror source and certify the combined list as
 required of the secretary of state under Subsection (g).
 SECTION 2.  Section 62.011, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (e) to read as
 follows:
 (d)  A state agency or the secretary of state may not charge a
 fee for furnishing an electronic [a] list of names required by
 Section 62.001.
 (e)  The commissioners court of a county that has adopted a
 jury selection plan must file with the Office of Court
 Administration of the Texas Judicial System a copy of the plan and
 any modification to the plan.
 SECTION 3.  Section 62.113, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) and amending Subsection (e) to read as
 follows:
 (b-1)  The list of persons excused or disqualified because of
 citizenship as required by Subsection (b) may not be combined with
 or submitted simultaneously with any other list required to be
 submitted to the voter registrar of the county, including a list
 submitted under Section 62.114.
 (e)  The information required to be filed with the secretary
 of state under this section must be filed electronically in the
 format prescribed by the secretary of state. The secretary of state
 may waive this requirement on application for a waiver submitted by
 the clerk.
 SECTION 4.  Section 62.114, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  The list compiled under this section of persons excused
 or disqualified because the person is not a resident of the county
 may not be combined with or submitted simultaneously with any other
 list required to be submitted to the voter registrar of the county,
 including a list submitted under Section 62.113.
 SECTION 5.  Sections 62.001(d) and (e), Government Code, are
 repealed.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *