By: RodrÃguez S.B. No. 2027 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 27, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development; April 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 19, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a study to evaluate by region training and employment opportunities in this state for individuals with an intellectual disability. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. STUDY ON TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS WITH AN INTELLECTUAL DISABILITY. (a) The Health and Human Services Commission in conjunction with the Texas Workforce Commission shall conduct a study regarding occupational training programs available in this state for individuals with an intellectual disability. (b) The study must: (1) determine regions in this state where the training programs should be improved or expanded; and (2) determine strategies for placing trained individuals with intellectual disabilities into fulfilling jobs using existing or improved training programs. (c) Not later than December 1, 2018, the Health and Human Services Commission shall report the results of the study to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the appropriate standing committees of the senate and the house of representatives. (d) This section expires September 1, 2019. SECTION 2. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *