Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2027 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/18/2017

                    S.B. No. 2027


 AN ACT
 relating to a study to evaluate by region training and employment
 opportunities in this state for individuals with an intellectual
 disability.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  STUDY ON TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES
 FOR INDIVIDUALS WITH AN INTELLECTUAL DISABILITY. (a)  The Health
 and Human Services Commission in conjunction with the Texas
 Workforce Commission shall conduct a study regarding occupational
 training programs available in this state for individuals with an
 intellectual disability.
 (b)  The study must:
 (1)  determine regions in this state where the training
 programs should be improved or expanded; and
 (2)  determine strategies for placing trained
 individuals with intellectual disabilities into fulfilling jobs
 using existing or improved training programs.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2018, the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall report the results of the study to the
 governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and the appropriate standing committees of the
 senate and the house of representatives.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect September
 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2027 passed the Senate on
 April 25, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2027 passed the House on
 May 18, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 121, Nays 25, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor