Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB203 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 203
 (In the Senate - Filed November 14, 2016; January 25, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; March 30, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 30, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to removing the deadline for the Department of Family and
 Protective Services to enter into permanency care assistance
 agreements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 264.857, Family Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *