Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2056 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/27/2017

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 2056
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 28, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 27, 2017, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0, 2 present not voting; April 27, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2056 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by
 certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 351, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 351.10711 to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.10711.  ALLOCATION OF REVENUE FOR MAINTENANCE,
 ENHANCEMENT, AND UPGRADE OF SPORTS FACILITIES AND FIELDS BY CERTAIN
 MUNICIPALITIES. (a)  This section applies only to a municipality
 that is the county seat of a county that has a population of more
 than 10,000 and contains a portion of Mound Lake.
 (b)  In addition to other authorized uses, a municipality to
 which this section applies may use revenue derived from the tax
 imposed under this chapter to promote tourism by maintaining,
 enhancing, or upgrading sports facilities or fields, provided that:
 (1)  the requirements of Section 351.1076 are met if
 the municipality uses the revenue to enhance or upgrade a sports
 facility or field;
 (2)  the municipality owns the sports facilities or
 fields; and
 (3)  the sports facilities and fields have been used,
 in the preceding calendar year, a combined total of more than 10
 times for district, state, regional, or national sports
 tournaments.
 (c)  A municipality that uses revenue derived from the tax
 imposed under this chapter as authorized by Subsection (b) may not
 reduce the percentage of revenue from the tax imposed under this
 chapter and allocated for a purpose described by Section
 351.101(a)(3) to a percentage that is less than the average
 percentage of that revenue allocated by the municipality for that
 purpose during the 36-month period preceding the date the
 municipality begins using the revenue as authorized by Subsection
 (b).
 SECTION 2.  Section 351.1076(a), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  A municipality that spends municipal hotel occupancy
 tax revenue for the enhancement and upgrading of existing sports
 facilities or fields as authorized by Section 351.101(a)(7) or
 351.10711:
 (1)  shall determine the amount of municipal hotel
 occupancy tax revenue generated for the municipality by hotel
 activity attributable to the sports events and tournaments held on
 the enhanced or upgraded facilities or fields for five years after
 the date the enhancements and upgrades are completed; and
 (2)  may not spend hotel occupancy tax revenue for the
 enhancement and upgrading of the facilities or fields in a total
 amount that exceeds the amount of area hotel revenue attributable
 to the enhancements and upgrades.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *