Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2103 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2017

                    By: Garcia S.B. No. 2103
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 28, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 May 3, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 1; May 3, 2017, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2103 By:  Garcia


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain municipalities to alter prima
 facie speed limits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 545.356(b-1) and (b-2), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Except as provided by Subsection (b-3), the governing
 body of a municipality, for a street [highway] or a part of a street
 [highway] in the municipality that is not an officially designated
 or marked street [highway] or road of the state highway system, may
 declare a lower speed limit of not less than 20 [25] miles per hour,
 if the governing body determines that the prima facie speed limit on
 the street [highway] is unreasonable or unsafe.
 (b-2)  Subsection (b-1) applies only to a two-lane,
 undivided street [highway] or part of a street [highway].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *