Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2110 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2017

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 2110
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 28, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 6, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 6, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the Port Authority Advisory
 Committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 55.006(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The committee consists of eight [seven] members
 appointed by the commission.  The members shall be appointed as
 follows:
 (1)  one member from the Port of Houston Authority;
 (2)  three members who represent maritime ports on the
 upper Texas coast; [and]
 (3)  three members who represent maritime ports on the
 lower Texas coast; and
 (4)  one member who represents an inland port.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *