Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2204 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/19/2017

                    By: Hancock S.B. No. 2204
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 29, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of the certified capital company
 program by the office of the comptroller of public accounts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Effective December 31, 2018, Chapter 228,
 Insurance Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  The repeal by this Act of Chapter 228, Insurance
 Code, does not affect premium tax credits for certified capital
 invested under that chapter before the effective date of the repeal
 and the recapture of those credits.  Premium tax credits for
 certified capital invested before the effective date of the repeal
 and the recapture of those credits are governed by the law as it
 existed immediately before that date, and that law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *