Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2205 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2017

                    By: Hancock S.B. No. 2205
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 29, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 24, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2205 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to automated motor vehicles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 545, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter J to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER J. OPERATION OF AUTOMATED MOTOR VEHICLES
 Sec. 545.451.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Automated driving system" means hardware and
 software that, when installed on a motor vehicle and engaged, are
 collectively capable of performing, without any intervention or
 supervision by a human operator:
 (A)  all aspects of the entire dynamic driving
 task for the vehicle on a sustained basis; and
 (B)  any fallback maneuvers necessary to respond
 to a failure of the system.
 (2)  "Automated motor vehicle" means a motor vehicle on
 which an automated driving system is installed.
 (3)  "Entire dynamic driving task" means the
 operational and tactical aspects of operating a vehicle.  The term:
 (A)  includes:
 (i)  operational aspects, including
 steering, braking, accelerating, and monitoring the vehicle and the
 roadway; and
 (ii)  tactical aspects, including
 responding to events, determining when to change lanes, turning,
 using signals, and other related actions; and
 (B)  does not include strategic aspects,
 including determining destinations or waypoints.
 (4)  "Human operator" means a natural person in an
 automated motor vehicle who controls the entire dynamic driving
 task.
 (5)  "Owner" has the meaning assigned by Section
 501.002(19), except that the term includes a manufacturer of an
 automated motor vehicle or of an automated driving system.
 Sec. 545.452.  SUBCHAPTER AND DEPARTMENT GOVERN
 EXCLUSIVELY. (a)  Unless otherwise provided by this subchapter,
 the following are governed exclusively by this subchapter:
 (1)  automated motor vehicles, including any
 commercial use or operation of automated motor vehicles; and
 (2)  automated driving systems.
 (b)  A political subdivision of this state or a state agency
 may not impose a franchise or other regulation related to an
 automated motor vehicle or automated driving system.
 Sec. 545.453.  OPERATOR OF AUTOMATED MOTOR VEHICLE.
 (a)  When an automated driving system installed on a motor vehicle
 is engaged:
 (1)  the owner of the automated driving system is
 considered the operator of the automated motor vehicle solely for
 the purpose of assessing compliance with applicable traffic or
 motor vehicle laws, regardless of whether the person is physically
 present in the vehicle while the vehicle is operating; and
 (2)  the automated driving system is considered to be
 licensed to operate the vehicle.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, a licensed human
 operator is not required to operate a motor vehicle if an automated
 driving system installed on the vehicle is engaged.
 Sec. 545.454.  AUTOMATED MOTOR VEHICLE OPERATION. (a)  An
 automated motor vehicle may operate in this state with the
 automated driving system engaged, regardless of whether a human
 operator is physically present in the vehicle.
 (b)  An automated motor vehicle may not operate on a highway
 in this state with the automated driving system engaged unless the
 vehicle is:
 (1)  capable of operating in compliance with applicable
 traffic and motor vehicle laws of this state, subject to this
 subchapter;
 (2)  equipped with a recording device system as defined
 by Section 547.615;
 (3)  in compliance with applicable federal law and
 Federal Motor Vehicle Safety Standards;
 (4)  registered and titled in accordance with the laws
 of this state; and
 (5)  covered by motor vehicle liability coverage or
 self-insurance in an amount equal to the amount of coverage that is
 required under the laws of this state.
 Sec. 545.455.  DUTIES FOLLOWING ACCIDENT INVOLVING
 AUTOMATED MOTOR VEHICLE. In the event of an accident involving an
 automated motor vehicle, the automated motor vehicle or any human
 operator of the automated motor vehicle shall, regardless of
 whether the operator is required to do so under Chapter 550:
 (1)  stop the vehicle at or return the vehicle to the
 scene of the accident; and
 (2)  immediately by the quickest means of communication
 give notice of the accident to the:
 (A)  local police department if the accident
 occurred in a municipality;
 (B)  local police department or the sheriff's
 office if the accident occurred not more than 100 feet outside the
 limits of a municipality; or
 (C)  sheriff's office or the nearest office of the
 Department of Public Safety if the accident is not required to be
 reported under Paragraph (A) or (B).
 Sec. 545.456.  LIABILITY. (a)  The manufacturer of an
 automated motor vehicle or the manufacturer of an automated driving
 system is not liable, including for equitable relief, for damage
 that arises from modifications made by a person other than the
 manufacturer or without the consent of the manufacturer to:
 (1)  the automated motor vehicle; or
 (2)  an automated driving system installed on the
 automated motor vehicle.
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not supersede or otherwise affect
 any contractual obligations between an automated motor vehicle
 manufacturer or automated driving system manufacturer and a person
 that modifies a motor vehicle after the vehicle is manufactured by
 installing an automated driving system in the vehicle to convert
 the vehicle to an automated motor vehicle.
 Sec. 545.457.  VEHICLE CLASSIFICATION. An owner as defined
 by Section 502.001(31) may identify the vehicle to the department
 as an automated motor vehicle or an automated driving system.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  In this section, "a request to intervene"
 means notification by a vehicle to the human driver that the driver
 should promptly begin or resume performance of the entire dynamic
 driving task.
 (b)  For purposes of Subchapter J, Chapter 545,
 Transportation Code, as added by this Act, a motor vehicle equipped
 with hardware and software capable of engaging in the entire
 dynamic driving task with the expectation that a human driver will
 respond appropriately to a request to intervene is subject to
 Sections 545.452(b) and 545.456, Transportation Code, as added by
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *