Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2227 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2017

                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 2227
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2017; March 29, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 20, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 20, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an increase in the fee for permits issued for the
 movement of oversize or overweight vehicles carrying cargo in
 Hidalgo County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 623.364(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The authority may collect a fee for permits issued under
 this subchapter.  Beginning September 1, 2017 [2013], the maximum
 amount of the fee may not exceed $200 [$80] per trip.  On September 1
 of each subsequent year, the authority may adjust the maximum fee
 amount as necessary to reflect the percentage change during the
 preceding year in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers
 (CPI-U), U.S. City Average, published monthly by the United States
 Bureau of Labor Statistics or its successor in function.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *