Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB224 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2017

                    By: Watson, et al. S.B. No. 224
 (Davis of Harris, Zerwas)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sunset review date for the Cancer Prevention and
 Research Institute of Texas and the time for awarding cancer
 research and prevention grants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 102.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 102.003.  SUNSET PROVISION. The Cancer Prevention and
 Research Institute of Texas is subject to Chapter 325, Government
 Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided
 by that chapter, the institute is abolished and this chapter
 expires September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 2.  Section 102.254, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 102.254.  PERIOD FOR AWARDS. The oversight committee
 may not award money under Subchapter E [before January 1, 2008, or]
 after August 31, 2022 [2020].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.