Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2255 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/12/2017

                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 2255
 (In the Senate - Filed March 28, 2017; April 3, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 12, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 12, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2255 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the Comal County Juvenile Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 152.0521(a), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The Comal County Juvenile Board is composed of:
 (1)  the county judge;
 (2)  the judge of each county court at law in the
 county;
 (3)  the judge of the 22nd District Court;
 (4)  the judge of the 207th District Court;
 (5) [(4)]  the judge of the 433rd District Court;
 (6)  the [(5) an additional] judge of the 274th
 District Court [district courts having jurisdiction in Comal
 County, to be appointed biennially by the local administrative
 district judge]; and
 (7) [(6)]  the criminal district attorney of Comal
 County.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *