By: Perry S.B. No. 2262 (In the Senate - Filed March 29, 2017; April 3, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; April 11, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 11, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the dissolution of the Central Colorado River Authority. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. DEFINITIONS. In this Act: (1) "Authority" means the Central Colorado River Authority. (2) "Commission" means the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality. (3) "County" means Coleman County. SECTION 2. MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING; TRANSFER OF ASSETS. (a) Not later than December 31, 2017, the authority and the county shall enter into a memorandum of understanding that governs the transfer of the following by the authority to the county: (1) the authority's remaining financial assets, after the discharge of any debts of the authority, in the form of cash, investments, and proceeds from the sale of the authority's personal property and real property, including lakes, reservoirs, dams, water rights, and other real property related to the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the authority; and (2) the authority's remaining personal property and real property, including lakes, reservoirs, dams, water rights, and other real property related to the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the authority in the event the property does not sell before December 31, 2018. (b) The memorandum of understanding must include: (1) a timeline for the sale of the authority's personal property and real property, including the authority's lakes, reservoirs, dams, water rights, and other real property related to the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the authority; (2) the acts necessary to complete the sale of the authority's lakes, reservoirs, dams, water rights, and other real property related to the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the authority to third parties before December 31, 2018, in accordance with state law governing the sale of property by a political subdivision of this state, including Chapter 272, Local Government Code; and (3) the acts necessary to complete the transfer of the authority's lakes, reservoirs, dams, water rights, and other real property related to the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the authority to the county in accordance with the rules of the commission, the Water Code, and other applicable law, in the event the property does not sell before December 31, 2018. (c) Section 8505.107, Special District Local Laws Code, does not apply to a transfer, sale, conveyance, or owner disposition of personal or real property by the authority in accordance with the memorandum of understanding entered into under this section. (d) Notwithstanding Section 81.032, Local Government Code, the county may accept the donation of: (1) the authority's financial assets, including cash, investments, and proceeds from the sale of the authority's personal property and real property, including lakes, reservoirs, dams, water rights, and other real property related to the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the authority; and (2) the authority's personal property and real property, including lakes, reservoirs, dams, water rights, and other real property related to the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the authority, in the event the property does not sell before December 31, 2018. (e) Not later than December 31, 2018, all actions described in the memorandum of understanding entered into under this section must be completed. SECTION 3. DISSOLUTION OF DISTRICT. After the completion of the activities in the memorandum of understanding described by Section 2 of this Act, the authority is dissolved. SECTION 4. AMENDMENT. Section 325.025(b), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) This section applies to the: (1) Angelina and Neches River Authority; (2) Bandera County River Authority and Groundwater District; (3) Brazos River Authority; (4) [Central Colorado River Authority; [(5)] Guadalupe-Blanco River Authority; (5) [(6)] Lavaca-Navidad River Authority; (6) [(7)] Lower Colorado River Authority; (7) [(8)] Lower Neches Valley Authority; (8) [(9)] Nueces River Authority; (9) [(10)] Palo Duro River Authority of Texas; (10) [(11)] Red River Authority of Texas; (11) [(12)] Sabine River Authority of Texas; (12) [(13)] San Antonio River Authority; (13) [(14)] San Jacinto River Authority; (14) [(15)] Sulphur River Basin Authority; (15) [(16)] Trinity River Authority of Texas; (16) [(17)] Upper Colorado River Authority; and (17) [(18)] Upper Guadalupe River Authority. SECTION 5. REPEALER. Chapter 8505, Special District Local Laws Code, is repealed. SECTION 6. NOTICE. (a) The legal notice of the intention to introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies, officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313, Government Code. (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality. (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives within the required time. (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled and accomplished. SECTION 7. EFFECTIVE DATE. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017. (b) Sections 4 and 5 of this Act take effect January 1, 2019. * * * * *