Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2262 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/25/2017

                    S.B. No. 2262


 AN ACT
 relating to the dissolution of the Central Colorado River
 Authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
 (1)  "Authority" means the Central Colorado River
 Authority.
 (2)  "Commission" means the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (3)  "County" means Coleman County.
 SECTION 2.  MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING; TRANSFER OF ASSETS.
 (a)  Not later than December 31, 2017, the authority and the county
 shall enter into a memorandum of understanding that governs the
 transfer of the following by the authority to the county:
 (1)  the authority's remaining financial assets, after
 the discharge of any debts of the authority, in the form of cash,
 investments, and proceeds from the sale of the authority's personal
 property and real property, including lakes, reservoirs, dams,
 water rights, and other real property related to the lakes,
 reservoirs, or dams of the authority; and
 (2)  the authority's remaining personal property and
 real property, including lakes, reservoirs, dams, water rights, and
 other real property related to the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the
 authority in the event the property does not sell before December
 31, 2018.
 (b)  The memorandum of understanding must include:
 (1)  a timeline for the sale of the authority's personal
 property and real property, including the authority's lakes,
 reservoirs, dams, water rights, and other real property related to
 the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the authority;
 (2)  the acts necessary to complete the sale of the
 authority's lakes, reservoirs, dams, water rights, and other real
 property related to the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the authority
 to third parties before December 31, 2018, in accordance with state
 law governing the sale of property by a political subdivision of
 this state, including Chapter 272, Local Government Code; and
 (3)  the acts necessary to complete the transfer of the
 authority's lakes, reservoirs, dams, water rights, and other real
 property related to the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the authority
 to the county in accordance with the rules of the commission, the
 Water Code, and other applicable law, in the event the property does
 not sell before December 31, 2018.
 (c)  Section 8505.107, Special District Local Laws Code,
 does not apply to a transfer, sale, conveyance, or owner
 disposition of personal or real property by the authority in
 accordance with the memorandum of understanding entered into under
 this section.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Section 81.032, Local Government Code,
 the county may accept the donation of:
 (1)  the authority's financial assets, including cash,
 investments, and proceeds from the sale of the authority's personal
 property and real property, including lakes, reservoirs, dams,
 water rights, and other real property related to the lakes,
 reservoirs, or dams of the authority; and
 (2)  the authority's personal property and real
 property, including lakes, reservoirs, dams, water rights, and
 other real property related to the lakes, reservoirs, or dams of the
 authority, in the event the property does not sell before December
 31, 2018.
 (e)  Not later than December 31, 2018, all actions described
 in the memorandum of understanding entered into under this section
 must be completed.
 SECTION 3.  DISSOLUTION OF DISTRICT. After the completion
 of the activities in the memorandum of understanding described by
 Section 2 of this Act, the authority is dissolved.
 SECTION 4.  AMENDMENT. Section 325.025(b), Government Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  This section applies to the:
 (1)  Angelina and Neches River Authority;
 (2)  Bandera County River Authority and Groundwater
 District;
 (3)  Brazos River Authority;
 (4)  [Central Colorado River Authority;
 [(5)]  Guadalupe-Blanco River Authority;
 (5) [(6)]  Lavaca-Navidad River Authority;
 (6) [(7)]  Lower Colorado River Authority;
 (7) [(8)]  Lower Neches Valley Authority;
 (8) [(9)]  Nueces River Authority;
 (9) [(10)]  Palo Duro River Authority of Texas;
 (10) [(11)]  Red River Authority of Texas;
 (11) [(12)]  Sabine River Authority of Texas;
 (12) [(13)]  San Antonio River Authority;
 (13) [(14)]  San Jacinto River Authority;
 (14) [(15)]  Sulphur River Basin Authority;
 (15) [(16)]  Trinity River Authority of Texas;
 (16) [(17)]  Upper Colorado River Authority; and
 (17) [(18)]  Upper Guadalupe River Authority.
 SECTION 5.  REPEALER.  Chapter 8505, Special District Local
 Laws Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 6.  NOTICE.  (a)  The legal notice of the intention
 to introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 7.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  (a)  Except as provided by
 Subsection (b) of this section, this Act takes effect September 1,
 2017.
 (b)  Sections 4 and 5 of this Act take effect January 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2262 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2262 passed the House on
 May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 4, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor