Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2270 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/27/2017

                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 2270
 (In the Senate - Filed April 11, 2017; April 12, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 27, 2017,
 reported favorably, as amended, by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 3; April 27, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 1 By:  Lucio
 Amend S.B. 2270 by adding the following appropriately
 numbered SECTION to the bill and renumbering the subsequent
 SECTIONS of the bill appropriately:
 SECTION 2.  The commissioner of education is required to
 implement this Act only if the legislature appropriates money
 specifically for that purpose.  If the legislature does not
 appropriate money specifically for that purpose, the commissioner
 of education may, but is not required to, implement this Act using
 other appropriations available for the purpose.
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to expansion of a pilot program under the foundation
 school program for funding prekindergarten programs provided by
 certain school districts with early high school graduation
 programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.2527(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  As a pilot program to enable the state to evaluate the
 benefit of providing additional funding at the prekindergarten
 level for low-income students, the commissioner shall provide
 prekindergarten funding in accordance with this section to a school
 district located in the regional boundaries of the Region 1
 education service center [a county that borders the United Mexican
 States and the Gulf of Mexico].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *