Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB260 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Huffines, Hall S.B. No. 260
 (In the Senate - Filed November 29, 2016; January 30, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs &
 Border Security; April 11, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 3; April 11, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the abolishment of the Office of Immigration and
 Refugee Affairs and the Governor's Advisory Committee on
 Immigration and Refugees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 752, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  The Office of Immigration and Refugee Affairs
 and the Governor's Advisory Committee on Immigration and Refugees
 are abolished. On the effective date of this Act:
 (1)  all money other than federal money of the office is
 transferred to the Health and Human Services Commission;
 (2)  all contracts, leases, rights, obligations, and
 personal property, including records, in the custody of the office,
 other than federal contracts, leases, rights, obligations, and
 personal property, are transferred to the commission; and
 (3)  all remaining federal money, contracts, leases,
 rights, obligations, and personal property are transferred as
 directed by the director of the Office of Refugee Resettlement of
 the United States Department of Health and Human Services.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *