Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB277 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Campbell, Estes S.B. No. 277
 (In the Senate - Filed December 8, 2016; January 30, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs &
 Border Security; March 13, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 3; March 13, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of certain property for certain ad
 valorem tax incentives relating to wind-powered energy devices.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 312, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 312.0021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 312.0021.  PROHIBITION ON ABATEMENT OF TAXES ON CERTAIN
 PROPERTY NEAR MILITARY AVIATION FACILITY. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Military aviation facility" means a base,
 station, fort, camp, auxiliary airfield, or range at which aviation
 operations or training is conducted by the United States Air Force,
 the United States Air Force Reserve, the United States Army, the
 United States Army Reserve, the United States Navy, the United
 States Navy Reserve, the United States Marine Corps, the United
 States Marine Corps Reserve, the United States Coast Guard, the
 United States Coast Guard Reserve, or the Texas National Guard.
 (2)  "Wind-powered energy device" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 11.27.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter, an
 owner or lessee of a parcel of real property that is located wholly
 or partly in a reinvestment zone may not receive an exemption from
 taxation of any portion of the value of the parcel of real property
 or of tangible personal property located on the parcel of real
 property under a tax abatement agreement under this chapter that is
 entered into on or after September 1, 2017, if, on or after
 September 1, 2017, a wind-powered energy device is installed or
 constructed on the same parcel of real property at a location that
 is within 30 nautical miles of the boundaries of a military aviation
 facility located in this state. The prohibition provided by this
 section applies regardless of whether the wind-powered energy
 device is installed or constructed at a location that is in the
 reinvestment zone.
 SECTION 2.  Section 313.024, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this
 subchapter, an owner of a parcel of land that is located wholly or
 partly in a reinvestment zone, a new building constructed on the
 parcel of land, a new improvement erected or affixed on the parcel
 of land, or tangible personal property placed in service in the
 building or improvement or on the parcel of land may not receive a
 limitation on appraised value under this subchapter for the parcel
 of land, building, improvement, or tangible personal property under
 an agreement under this subchapter that is entered into on or after
 September 1, 2017, if, on or after September 1, 2017, a wind-powered
 energy device is installed or constructed on the same parcel of land
 at a location that is within 30 nautical miles of the boundaries of
 a military aviation facility located in this state. The
 prohibition provided by this subsection applies regardless of
 whether the wind-powered energy device is installed or constructed
 at a location that is in the reinvestment zone.
 SECTION 3.  Section 313.024(e), Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivisions (8) and (9) to read as follows:
 (8)  "Military aviation facility" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 312.0021.
 (9)  "Wind-powered energy device" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 11.27.
 SECTION 4.  Section 312.0021, Tax Code, as added by this Act,
 and Section 313.024, Tax Code, as amended by this Act, apply only to
 ad valorem taxes imposed for a tax year beginning on or after
 January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2018.
 * * * * *