Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB277 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 277


 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of certain property for certain ad
 valorem tax incentives relating to wind-powered energy devices.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  The legislature finds that:
 (1)  the Texas Military Preparedness Commission has
 found that military installations located in this state generate
 $136 billion in economic activity each year and directly or
 indirectly contribute to the existence of almost 900,000 jobs;
 (2)  military aviation facilities in this state are of
 vital importance to the security of this state and the nation and
 are an integral part of this state's economy;
 (3)  the area surrounding a military aviation facility
 is sensitive to security concerns and requires special attention by
 this state;
 (4)  wind-powered energy devices and wind energy are
 important components of this state's production of electricity; and
 (5)  the United States Department of Defense uses the
 base realignment and closure process to reorganize the department's
 base structure and has used the process to close more than 350
 military bases since 1988.
 (b)  This Act is for the purposes of:
 (1)  promoting the public health, safety, and general
 welfare of this state;
 (2)  protecting and preserving military aviation
 facilities, the areas surrounding those facilities, and the
 aviation operations or training conducted at those facilities from
 any unintended consequences occurring as a result of the
 installation or construction of wind-powered energy devices on
 property located in close proximity to the boundaries of those
 facilities;
 (3)  encouraging the development of wind farms and the
 installation or construction of wind-powered energy devices in this
 state under reasonable state regulations that recognize the
 importance of wind energy and take into account the need to support
 and protect military aviation facilities located in this state from
 the United States Department of Defense's base realignment and
 closure process;
 (4)  ensuring that an owner of property on which
 wind-powered energy devices were constructed, or were under
 construction, before September 1, 2017, and that is located in
 close proximity to the boundaries of a military aviation facility
 continues to be eligible to receive tax benefits under Chapter 312
 or 313, Tax Code; and
 (5)  allowing an owner of property located in close
 proximity to the boundaries of a military aviation facility to
 continue to allow the installation or construction of wind-powered
 energy devices on that property in the event the owner elects not to
 seek tax benefits for that property under Chapter 312 or 313, Tax
 Code.
 (c)  This Act may not be construed as limiting the ability of
 a person to receive a tax benefit under Chapter 312 or 313, Tax
 Code, for property that the person owns and on which a wind-powered
 energy device is installed or constructed other than under the
 conditions relating to the proximity of that property to a military
 aviation facility as expressly provided by this Act.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 312, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 312.0021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 312.0021.  PROHIBITION ON ABATEMENT OF TAXES ON CERTAIN
 PROPERTY NEAR MILITARY AVIATION FACILITY. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Military aviation facility" means a base,
 station, fort, or camp at which fixed-wing aviation operations or
 training is conducted by the United States Air Force, the United
 States Air Force Reserve, the United States Army, the United States
 Army Reserve, the United States Navy, the United States Navy
 Reserve, the United States Marine Corps, the United States Marine
 Corps Reserve, the United States Coast Guard, the United States
 Coast Guard Reserve, or the Texas National Guard.
 (2)  "Wind-powered energy device" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 11.27.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter, an
 owner or lessee of a parcel of real property that is located wholly
 or partly in a reinvestment zone may not receive an exemption from
 taxation of any portion of the value of the parcel of real property
 or of tangible personal property located on the parcel of real
 property under a tax abatement agreement under this chapter that is
 entered into on or after September 1, 2017, if, on or after that
 date, a wind-powered energy device is installed or constructed on
 the same parcel of real property at a location that is within 25
 nautical miles of the boundaries of a military aviation facility
 located in this state. The prohibition provided by this section
 applies regardless of whether the wind-powered energy device is
 installed or constructed at a location that is in the reinvestment
 zone.
 (c)  The prohibition provided by this section does not apply
 if the wind-powered energy device is installed or constructed as
 part of an expansion or repowering of an existing project.
 SECTION 3.  Section 313.024, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this
 subchapter, an owner of a parcel of land that is located wholly or
 partly in a reinvestment zone, a new building constructed on the
 parcel of land, a new improvement erected or affixed on the parcel
 of land, or tangible personal property placed in service in the
 building or improvement or on the parcel of land may not receive a
 limitation on appraised value under this subchapter for the parcel
 of land, building, improvement, or tangible personal property under
 an agreement under this subchapter that is entered into on or after
 September 1, 2017, if, on or after that date, a wind-powered energy
 device is installed or constructed on the same parcel of land at a
 location that is within 25 nautical miles of the boundaries of a
 military aviation facility located in this state. The prohibition
 provided by this subsection applies regardless of whether the
 wind-powered energy device is installed or constructed at a
 location that is in the reinvestment zone.
 SECTION 4.  Section 313.024(e), Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivisions (8) and (9) to read as follows:
 (8)  "Military aviation facility" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 312.0021.
 (9)  "Wind-powered energy device" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 11.27.
 SECTION 5.  Notwithstanding Sections 312.0021 and
 313.024(b-1), Tax Code, as added by this Act, the change in law made
 by this Act does not apply to a tax abatement agreement under
 Chapter 312, Tax Code, or an application for a limitation on
 appraised value under Chapter 313, Tax Code, the approval of which
 is pending on the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 277 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 22, Nays 9;
 May 25, 2017, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2017, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2017, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 19,
 Nays 11.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 277 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 134,
 Nays 10, two present not voting; May 26, 2017, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2017, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 97, Nays 47, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor