Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB292 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Huffman, et al. S.B. No. 292
 (In the Senate - Filed December 13, 2016; January 30, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 10, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 April 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 292 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a grant program to reduce recidivism,
 arrest, and incarceration of individuals with mental illness.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0993 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0993.  GRANT PROGRAM TO REDUCE RECIDIVISM, ARREST,
 AND INCARCERATION AMONG INDIVIDUALS WITH MENTAL ILLNESS AND TO
 REDUCE WAIT TIME FOR FORENSIC COMMITMENT. (a)  For purposes of
 this section, "low-income household" means a household with a total
 income at or below 200 percent of the federal poverty guideline.
 (b)  Using money appropriated to the commission for that
 purpose, each state fiscal year the commission shall make grants to
 county-based community collaboratives for the purposes of
 reducing:
 (1)  recidivism by, the frequency of arrests of, and
 incarceration of persons with mental illness; and
 (2)  the total waiting time for forensic commitment of
 persons with mental illness to a state hospital.
 (c)  A community collaborative is eligible to receive a grant
 under this section only if the collaborative includes a county, a
 local mental health authority that operates in the county, and each
 hospital district, if any, located in the county.  A community
 collaborative may include other local entities designated by the
 collaborative's members.
 (d)  The commission shall condition each grant provided to a
 community collaborative under this section on the collaborative
 submitting a plan described by Subsection (i) and providing
 matching funds from nonstate sources in a total amount at least
 equal to the awarded grant amount.  To raise matching funds, a
 collaborative may seek and receive gifts, grants, or donations from
 any person.
 (e)  Not later than the 30th day of each fiscal year, the
 commission shall make available to a community collaborative
 established in the most populous county in this state a grant in an
 amount equal to the lesser of:
 (1)  the amount appropriated to the commission for that
 fiscal year for a mental health jail diversion pilot program in that
 county; or
 (2)  the collaborative's available matching funds.
 (f)  The commission shall estimate the number of persons with
 serious mental illness in low-income households located in each of
 the 20 most populous counties in this state. For the purposes of
 distributing grants under this section to community collaboratives
 established in the 19 counties other than the most populous county,
 for each fiscal year the commission shall determine an amount of
 grant money available on a per person basis by dividing the amount
 of the grant made available under Subsection (e) by the estimated
 total number of persons with serious mental illness in low-income
 households located in the most populous county.
 (g)  Not later than the 60th day of each fiscal year, the
 commission shall make available to a community collaborative
 established in each of the 19 most populous counties in this state
 other than the most populous county a grant in an amount equal to
 the lesser of:
 (1)  an amount determined by multiplying the per person
 amount determined under Subsection (f) by the estimated number of
 cases of serious mental illness in low-income households in that
 county; or
 (2)  an amount equal to the collaborative's available
 matching funds.
 (h)  To the extent appropriated money remains available to
 the commission for that purpose after the commission makes grants
 available under Subsections (e) and (g), the commission shall make
 available to community collaboratives established in other
 counties in this state grants through a competitive request for
 proposal process. For purposes of awarding a grant under this
 subsection, a collaborative may include adjacent counties if, for
 each member county, the collaborative's members include a local
 mental health authority that operates in the county and each
 hospital district, if any, located in the county. The commission
 shall condition a grant awarded under this subsection on the
 collaborative submitting a plan described by Subsection (i).
 (i)  Not later than the 30th day of each fiscal year, the
 community collaboratives established in each of the 20 most
 populous counties in this state shall submit to the commission a
 plan that:
 (1)  is endorsed by each of the collaborative's member
 entities;
 (2)  identifies a target population;
 (3)  describes how the grant money and matching funds
 will be used;
 (4)  includes outcome measures to evaluate the success
 of the plan; and
 (5)  describes how the success of the plan in
 accordance with the outcome measures would further the state's
 interest in the grant program's purposes.
 (j)  Acceptable uses for the grant money and matching funds
 include:
 (1)  the continuation of a mental health jail diversion
 program;
 (2)  the establishment or expansion of a mental health
 jail diversion program;
 (3)  the establishment of alternatives to competency
 restoration in a state hospital, including outpatient competency
 restoration, inpatient competency restoration in a setting other
 than a state hospital, or jail-based competency restoration;
 (4)  the provision of assertive community treatment or
 forensic assertive community treatment with an outreach component;
 (5)  the provision of intensive mental health services
 and substance abuse treatment not readily available in the county;
 (6)  the provision of continuity of care services for
 an individual being released from a state hospital;
 (7)  the establishment of interdisciplinary rapid
 response teams to reduce law enforcement's involvement with mental
 health emergencies; and
 (8)  the provision of local community hospital, crisis,
 respite, or residential beds.
 (k)  Not later than December 31 following the end of the
 fiscal year for which the commission distributes a grant under this
 section, each community collaborative that receives a grant shall
 prepare and submit a report describing the effect of the grant money
 and matching funds in achieving the standard defined by the outcome
 measures in the plan submitted under Subsection (h) or (i).
 (l)  The commission may make inspections of the operation and
 provision of mental health services provided by a community
 collaborative to ensure state money appropriated for the grant
 program is used effectively.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *