Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB307 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/02/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    85R7353 GRM-D
 By: Nichols, Taylor of Collin S.B. No. 307


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the functions and territory of the Upper Colorado River
 Authority, following the recommendations of the Sunset Advisory
 Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 8506.003, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 8506.003.  TERRITORY.  Unless modified under
 Subchapter J, Chapter 49, Water Code, or other law, the authority's
 territory consists of that part of this state included in the
 boundaries of Coke, Concho, Crockett, Glasscock, Irion, Menard,
 Mitchell, Nolan, Reagan, Runnels, Schleicher, Sterling, Taylor,
 and Tom Green Counties.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 8506, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 8506.0021 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8506.0021.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. (a)  The
 authority is subject to review under Chapter 325, Government Code
 (Texas Sunset Act), but may not be abolished under that chapter.
 The review shall be conducted under Section 325.025, Government
 Code, as if the authority were a state agency scheduled to be
 abolished September 1, 2029, and every 12th year after that year.
 (b)  The authority shall pay the cost incurred by the Sunset
 Advisory Commission in performing the review. The Sunset Advisory
 Commission shall determine the cost, and the authority shall pay
 the amount promptly on receipt of a statement from the Sunset
 Advisory Commission detailing the cost.
 SECTION 3.  Section 8506.051, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection
 (d) to read as follows:
 (c)  Each director must be a resident of a county located in
 the authority's territory.  The governor shall attempt to achieve
 geographic representation throughout [Three directors must be
 residents of Tom Green County, three directors must be residents of
 Coke County, and three directors must be residents of counties
 contiguous to the authority or a county any part of which is within
 25 miles of] the authority in the appointment of directors.
 (d)  The governor shall designate a member of the board as
 the presiding officer of the board to serve in that capacity at the
 pleasure of the governor.
 SECTION 4.  Section 8506.056(a), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The board shall select a secretary[, a presiding
 officer,] and a treasurer.  The treasurer may also hold the office
 of secretary.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter B, Chapter 8506, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Sections 8506.060, 8506.061,
 8506.062, and 8506.063 to read as follows:
 Sec. 8506.060.  DIRECTOR TRAINING PROGRAM. (a)  A person who
 is appointed to and qualifies for office as a director may not vote,
 deliberate, or be counted as a director in attendance at a meeting
 of the board until the person completes a training program that
 complies with this section.
 (b)  The training program must provide the person with
 information regarding:
 (1)  the law governing authority operations;
 (2)  the programs, functions, rules, and budget of the
 authority;
 (3)  the scope of and limitations on the rulemaking
 authority of the authority;
 (4)  the results of the most recent formal audit of the
 authority;
 (5)  the requirements of:
 (A)  laws relating to open meetings, public
 information, administrative procedure, and disclosing conflicts of
 interest; and
 (B)  other laws applicable to directors of a river
 authority in performing their duties; and
 (6)  any applicable ethics policies adopted by the
 authority or the Texas Ethics Commission.
 (c)  A person appointed to the board is entitled to
 reimbursement by the authority for travel expenses incurred in
 attending the training program regardless of whether attendance at
 the program occurs before or after the person qualifies for office.
 (d)  The board shall create a training manual that includes
 the information required by Subsection (b). The board shall
 distribute a copy of the training manual annually to each director.
 On receipt of the training manual, each director shall sign and
 submit to the board a statement acknowledging receipt of the
 training manual.
 Sec. 8506.061.  SEPARATION OF POLICYMAKING AND MANAGEMENT
 FUNCTIONS. The board shall develop and implement policies that
 clearly separate the policymaking responsibilities of the board and
 the management responsibilities of the general manager and staff of
 the authority.
 Sec. 8506.062.  NEGOTIATED RULEMAKING AND ALTERNATIVE
 DISPUTE RESOLUTION. (a)  The board shall develop a policy to
 encourage the use of:
 (1)  negotiated rulemaking procedures under Chapter
 2008, Government Code, for the adoption of authority rules; and
 (2)  appropriate alternative dispute resolution
 procedures under Chapter 2009, Government Code, to assist in the
 resolution of internal and external disputes under the authority's
 jurisdiction.
 (b)  The authority's procedures relating to alternative
 dispute resolution must conform, to the extent possible, to any
 model guidelines issued by the State Office of Administrative
 Hearings for the use of alternative dispute resolution by state
 agencies.
 (c)  The authority shall:
 (1)  coordinate the implementation of the policy
 adopted under Subsection (a);
 (2)  provide training as needed to implement the
 procedures for negotiated rulemaking or alternative dispute
 resolution; and
 (3)  collect data concerning the effectiveness of those
 procedures.
 Sec. 8506.063.  PUBLIC COMMENT POLICY. The board shall
 develop and implement policies that provide the public with a
 reasonable opportunity to appear before the board and to speak on
 any agenda item at board meetings.
 SECTION 6.  Subchapter C, Chapter 8506, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 8506.116 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 8506.116.  COMPLAINTS. (a) The authority shall
 maintain a system to promptly and efficiently act on complaints
 filed with the authority. The authority shall maintain information
 about parties to the complaint, the subject matter of the
 complaint, a summary of the results of the review or investigation
 of the complaint, and its disposition.
 (b)  The authority shall make information available
 describing its procedures for complaint investigation and
 resolution.
 (c)  The authority shall periodically notify the complaint
 parties of the status of the complaint until final disposition.
 SECTION 7.  Section 1A, Chapter 126, General Laws, Acts of
 the 44th Legislature, Regular Session, 1935, is repealed.
 SECTION 8.  (a) Notwithstanding Section 8506.060(a),
 Special District Local Laws Code, as added by this Act, a person
 serving on the board of directors of the Upper Colorado River
 Authority may vote, deliberate, and be counted as a director in
 attendance at a meeting of the board until December 1, 2017.
 (b)  This section expires January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 9.  (a)  The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.