Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB315 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 315


 AN ACT
 relating to the enforcement of subpoenas, the regulation of pain
 management clinics, and the adoption of guidelines for prescribing
 certain opioids by the Texas Medical Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 153.007, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 153.007.  AUTHORITY TO ISSUE SUBPOENA OR ADMINISTER
 OATH; SUBPOENA ENFORCEMENT.
 SECTION 2.  Section 153.007, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (e) and (f) to read as follows:
 (e)  If a person fails to comply with a subpoena issued under
 this section, the board, acting through the attorney general, may
 file suit to enforce the subpoena in a district court in Travis
 County or in a county in which a hearing conducted by the board may
 be held.
 (f)  On finding that good cause exists for issuing the
 subpoena, the court shall order the person to comply with the
 subpoena.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter A, Chapter 168, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 168.003 to read as follows:
 Sec. 168.003.  LEGISLATIVE FINDING. The legislature finds
 that deaths resulting from the use of opioids and other controlled
 substances constitute a public health crisis and that there is a
 compelling state interest in the board closely regulating the
 prescribing of opioids and other controlled substances by
 physicians and their delegates. Accordingly, the legislature finds
 that inspections and investigations conducted by the board,
 including the board's use of subpoenas for immediate production,
 inspection, and copying of medical and billing records, are
 necessary to adequately regulate the prescribing of opioids and
 other controlled substances in order to protect the public health
 and welfare.
 SECTION 4.  Section 168.052, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 168.052.  INSPECTIONS. (a)  The board may inspect a
 pain management clinic certified under this chapter, including the
 documents of a physician practicing at the clinic, as necessary to
 ensure compliance with this chapter.
 (b)  The board may inspect a clinic or facility that is not
 certified under this chapter to determine whether the clinic or
 facility is required to be certified under Section 168.101.  The
 board by rule shall establish the grounds for conducting an
 inspection under this subsection, including grounds based on:
 (1)  the population of patients served by the clinic or
 facility;
 (2)  the volume or combination of drugs prescribed to
 patients served by the clinic or facility; and
 (3)  any other criteria the board considers sufficient
 to require an inspection of the clinic or facility.
 SECTION 5.  Section 168.201, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  For the purposes of this section, inappropriate
 prescribing includes nontherapeutic prescribing or other conduct
 as specified by board rule.
 SECTION 6.  Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 170 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 170. PRESCRIPTION OF OPIOID ANTAGONISTS
 Sec. 170.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter, "opioid
 antagonist" and "opioid-related drug overdose" have the meanings
 assigned by Section 483.101, Health and Safety Code.
 Sec. 170.002.  GUIDELINES. (a)  The board shall adopt
 guidelines for the prescription of opioid antagonists.
 (b)  The guidelines must address:
 (1)  prescribing an opioid antagonist to a patient to
 whom an opioid medication is also prescribed; and
 (2)  identifying patients at risk of an opioid-related
 drug overdose and prescribing an opioid antagonist to that patient
 or to a person in a position to administer the opioid antagonist to
 that patient.
 (c)  In adopting guidelines under this section, the board:
 (1)  shall consult materials published by the Substance
 Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration of the United
 States Department of Health and Human Services; and
 (2)  may consult other appropriate materials,
 including medical journals subject to peer review and publications
 by medical professional associations.
 Sec. 170.003.  LIABILITY FOR ACT OR OMISSION WITH RESPECT TO
 PRESCRIBING AN OPIOID ANTAGONIST. A physician who acts in good
 faith and with reasonable care, regardless of whether the physician
 follows the guidelines adopted under this chapter, is not subject
 to criminal or civil liability or any professional disciplinary
 action for:
 (1)  prescribing or failing to prescribe an opioid
 antagonist; or
 (2)  any outcome resulting from the eventual
 administration of an opioid antagonist prescribed by the physician.
 SECTION 7.  The change in law made by this Act relating to
 Chapter 170, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, and to conduct
 that is grounds for imposition of a disciplinary sanction applies
 only to conduct that occurs on or after September 1, 2017. Conduct
 that occurs before September 1, 2017, is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the conduct occurred, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 8.  The change in law made by this Act relating to
 Chapter 170, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, and to conduct
 that is the basis for civil liability applies only to conduct that
 occurs on or after September 1, 2017. Conduct that occurs before
 September 1, 2017, is governed by the law in effect on the date the
 conduct occurred, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 9.  The change in law made by this Act relating to
 Chapter 170, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, and to conduct
 that constitutes a criminal offense applies only to an offense
 committed on or after September 1, 2017. For purposes of this
 section, an offense is committed before September 1, 2017, if any
 element of the offense occurs before that date. An offense
 committed before September 1, 2017, is governed by the law in effect
 on the date the offense was committed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 315 passed the Senate on
 May 10, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 26, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 315 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 129,
 Nays 16, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor