Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB326 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Burton, Huffines S.B. No. 326
 (In the Senate - Filed December 14, 2016; January 30, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 March 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a court to return certain fees to a
 person whose criminal record has been expunged.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 102.006, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A court that grants a petition for expunction of a
 criminal record may order that any fee, or portion of a fee,
 required to be paid under this article or other law in relation to
 the petition be returned to the petitioner.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a petition for expunction filed on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A petition for expunction filed before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the petition
 was filed, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *