Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB331 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/27/2017

                    By: West S.B. No. 331
 (In the Senate - Filed December 15, 2016; January 30, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 February 27, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 February 27, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 331 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the temporary approval of a private or independent
 college or university to continue to participate in the tuition
 equalization grant program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.222(c), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  The coordinating board may grant temporary approval for
 a period of two years and may renew the approval twice [once].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *