Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB343 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Perry S.B. No. 343
 (In the Senate - Filed December 16, 2016; January 30, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 March 20, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 20, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 343 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution of the offense of improper sexual
 activity with a person under supervision.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 39.04, Penal Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.04.  VIOLATIONS OF THE CIVIL RIGHTS OF PERSON IN
 CUSTODY; IMPROPER SEXUAL ACTIVITY WITH PERSON IN CUSTODY OR UNDER
 SUPERVISION.
 SECTION 2.  Section 39.04(e)(2-a), Penal Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (2-a)  "Juvenile facility" means:
 (A)  a facility operated by the Texas Juvenile
 Justice Department or a private vendor under a contract with the
 Texas Juvenile Justice Department; or
 (B)  a facility for the detention or placement of
 juveniles under juvenile court jurisdiction and that is operated
 wholly or partly by [the Texas Juvenile Justice Department,] a
 juvenile board[,] or another governmental unit or by a private
 vendor under a contract with the [Texas Juvenile Justice
 Department,] juvenile board[,] or governmental unit.
 SECTION 3.  Section 39.04(f), Penal Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (f)  An employee of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice,
 the Texas Juvenile Justice Department, a juvenile facility, [or] a
 local juvenile probation department, or a community supervision and
 corrections department established under Chapter 76, Government
 Code, a person other than an employee who works for compensation at
 a juvenile facility or local juvenile probation department, or a
 volunteer at a juvenile facility or local juvenile probation
 department commits an offense if the actor [employee] engages in
 sexual contact, sexual intercourse, or deviate sexual intercourse
 with an individual who the actor [employee] knows is under the
 supervision of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Texas
 Juvenile Justice Department, [or] probation department, or
 community supervision and corrections department but not in the
 custody of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Texas Juvenile
 Justice Department, [or] probation department, or community
 supervision and corrections department.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *