Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB347 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/20/2017

                    By: Watson, Buckingham S.B. No. 347
 (In the Senate - Filed December 16, 2016; January 30, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 March 20, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 20, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 347 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of open meetings and public
 information laws to regional water planning groups and their
 committees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 16.053(h), Water Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (12) to read as follows:
 (12)  Each regional water planning group and any
 committee or subcommittee of a regional water planning group are
 subject to Chapters 551 and 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *