Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB364 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/13/2017

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 364
 (In the Senate - Filed December 19, 2016; February 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 13, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 13, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Alternate United States
 Highway 90 in Lavaca County as the Sheriff Ronnie Dodds Memorial
 Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.123 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.123.  SHERIFF RONNIE DODDS MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.
 (a)  The portion of Alternate United States Highway 90 in Lavaca
 County from the eastern municipal limits of Shiner to the western
 municipal limits of Hallettsville is designated as the Sheriff
 Ronnie Dodds Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Sheriff Ronnie Dodds Memorial Highway and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *