Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB396 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 396
 (In the Senate - Filed December 21, 2016; February 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 13, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 13, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Interstate Highway 10 in
 Guadalupe County as the Texas Game Warden Teyran "Ty" Patterson
 Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.123 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.123.  TEXAS GAME WARDEN TEYRAN "TY" PATTERSON
 MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a)  The portion of Interstate Highway 10 in
 Guadalupe County between its intersection with State Highway 123
 and its intersection with State Highway 130 is designated as the
 Texas Game Warden Teyran "Ty" Patterson Memorial Highway. This
 designation is in addition to any other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Texas Game Warden Teyran "Ty" Patterson Memorial
 Highway and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *