Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB396 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 396


 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of Business State Highway 123-B in
 Guadalupe County as the Texas Game Warden Teyran "Ty" Patterson
 Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.123 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.123.  TEXAS GAME WARDEN TEYRAN "TY" PATTERSON
 MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a)  Business State Highway 123-B in Guadalupe
 County is designated as the Texas Game Warden Teyran "Ty" Patterson
 Memorial Highway. This designation is in addition to any other
 designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Texas Game Warden Teyran "Ty" Patterson Memorial
 Highway and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 396 passed the Senate on
 April 3, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 396 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor