Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB397 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 397
 (In the Senate - Filed December 21, 2016; February 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 24, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 397 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the consultation policies of local mental health
 authorities with respect to sheriffs and their representatives.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 533.035, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A local mental health authority shall, at least once
 per year, consult with the sheriff or a representative of the
 sheriff of each county in the local authority's service area
 regarding the use of the funds received under Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *