Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB402 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/13/2017

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 402
 (In the Senate - Filed December 29, 2016; February 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 13, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 13, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice provided to persons with disabilities regarding
 the eligibility of persons with disabilities to use certain public
 transportation services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 461.009, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 461.009.  [ELIGIBILITY OF VISITORS TO USE CERTAIN]
 PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION SERVICES FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES.
 SECTION 2.  Section 461.009, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  To the extent practicable within available resources, a
 provider shall notify individuals who are certified by the provider
 as eligible to use the provider's services that the individuals are
 entitled to use another provider's service for not more than 21 days
 without an additional application.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *