Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB404 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 404
 (In the Senate - Filed December 29, 2016; February 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 March 20, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 20, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 404 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibiting certain health care practitioners from
 providing alcoholic beverages to certain persons; imposing an
 administrative penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle A, Title 3, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 116 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 116.  PROVIDING ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES PROHIBITED
 Sec. 116.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Health care practitioner" means an individual
 issued a license, certificate, registration, title, permit, or
 other authorization under this title to engage in a health care
 profession.
 (2)  "Licensing entity" means a department,
 commission, board, office, authority, or other agency of the state
 that regulates health care practitioners under this title.
 Sec. 116.002.  APPLICABILITY.  This chapter applies only to
 a health care practitioner who is authorized to:
 (1)  administer anesthesia or provide anesthesia
 services in an outpatient setting, including the health care
 practitioner's office; or
 (2)  prescribe or administer a prescription drug, as
 defined by Section 551.003.
 Sec. 116.003.  PROVIDING ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE PROHIBITED.
 (a)  Except as otherwise provided by Subsection (b), a health care
 practitioner or an employee or agent of a health care practitioner
 may not provide or otherwise make available to a patient or to a
 person accompanying the patient in the health care practitioner's
 office, including the patient's parent or guardian, an alcoholic
 beverage subject to regulation under the Alcoholic Beverage Code.
 (b)  This section does not apply to alcohol when used as, or
 contained in, a drug for the diagnosis, cure, mitigation,
 treatment, or prevention of illness, injury, or disease.
 (c)  A licensing entity may adopt rules necessary to
 implement this chapter.
 Sec. 116.004.  IMPOSITION OF ADMINISTRATIVE PENALTY. The
 appropriate licensing entity may impose an administrative penalty
 against a health care practitioner who violates Section 116.003 or
 a rule or order adopted under that section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *