Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB416 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson, West S.B. No. 416
 (In the Senate - Filed January 6, 2017; February 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 28, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; March 28, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the board of directors of the State
 Bar of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 81.020, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (b) and (d) and adding Subsection (e) to read
 as follows:
 (b)  The board is composed of:
 (1)  the officers of the state bar;
 (2)  the president, president-elect, and immediate
 past president of the Texas Young Lawyers Association;
 (3)  not more than 30 members of the state bar elected
 by the membership from their district as determined by the board;
 (4)  six persons appointed by the supreme court and
 confirmed by the senate who are not attorneys and who do not have,
 other than as consumers, a financial interest in the practice of
 law; and
 (5)  four outreach [minority member] directors
 appointed by the president as provided by Subsections [Subsection]
 (d) and (e).
 (d)  The president of the state bar appoints the outreach
 [minority member] directors, subject to confirmation by the board
 of directors. In making appointments under this subsection, the
 president shall [attempt to] appoint directors who demonstrate the
 sensitivity and knowledge gained from experiences in the legal
 profession and community necessary to ensure the board represents
 the interests of attorneys from the varied backgrounds that compose
 the membership of the state bar, including members of historically
 underrepresented [members of the different minority] groups
 [listed in Section 81.002(7)].
 (e)  Outreach [Minority member] directors serve three-year
 terms. To be eligible for appointment as an outreach [a minority
 member] director, at the time of appointment a person may [must:
 [(1)  be a minority member of the bar;
 [(2)]  not be serving as:
 (1)  an elected director [at the time of appointment];
 or
 (2)  an outreach [and
 [(3)  not be serving as a minority member] director [at
 the time of appointment].
 SECTION 2.  Section 81.002(7), Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  Notwithstanding Section 81.020, Government
 Code, as amended by this Act, a minority member serving on the board
 of directors of the State Bar of Texas on the effective date of this
 Act continues to serve the term to which the director was appointed.
 On expiration of the director's term, the president of the State Bar
 of Texas shall appoint an outreach director as required by Section
 81.020, Government Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *