Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB436 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2017

                    By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 436
 (In the Senate - Filed January 6, 2017; February 6, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 May 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the operation of the special education continuing
 advisory committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 29.006, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (d), (e), (f), (g), and (h) to read as follows:
 (d)  Committee meetings must be conducted in compliance with
 Chapter 551, Government Code.
 (e)  The committee shall provide a procedure for members of
 the public to speak at committee meetings. The procedure may not
 require a member of the public to register to speak earlier than the
 day of the meeting.
 (f)  The agency must post on the agency's Internet website:
 (1)  contact information for the committee, including
 an e-mail address;
 (2)  notice of each open meeting of the committee;
 (3)  minutes of each open meeting of the committee; and
 (4)  guidance concerning how to submit public comments
 to the committee.
 (g)  The committee shall develop a policy to encourage public
 participation with the committee.
 (h)  Not later than January 1 of each odd-numbered year, the
 committee shall submit a report to the legislature with recommended
 changes to state law and agency rules relating to special
 education. The committee shall include the committee's current
 policy on encouraging public participation, as required by
 Subsection (g), in the report.
 SECTION 2.  Section 29.006(d), Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to an open meeting of the special education
 continuing advisory committee held on or after the effective date
 of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *