Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB459 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Huffines, Perry S.B. No. 459
 (In the Senate - Filed January 11, 2017; February 6, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 May 8, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 1; May 8, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation or taxation of firearms, air guns,
 knives, or ammunition by a municipality or county.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 229.001, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Notwithstanding any other law, including Section 43.002
 of this code and Chapter 251, Agriculture Code, a municipality may
 not adopt or enforce regulations relating to:
 (1)  the transfer, sale, purchase, private ownership,
 keeping, transportation, manufacture, licensing, or registration
 of firearms, air guns, knives, ammunition, or firearm or air gun
 supplies; or
 (2)  the discharge of a firearm or air gun at a sport
 shooting range.
 (a-1)  A municipality may not impose a tax on firearms, air
 guns, knives, ammunition, or firearm or air gun supplies, other
 than a tax authorized by state law.
 SECTION 2.  Section 236.002, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Notwithstanding any other law, including Chapter 251,
 Agriculture Code, a county may not adopt or enforce regulations
 relating to:
 (1)  the transfer, sale, purchase, private ownership,
 keeping, transportation, manufacture, licensing, or registration
 of firearms, air guns, knives, ammunition, or firearm or air gun
 supplies; or
 (2)  the discharge of a firearm or air gun at a sport
 shooting range.
 (a-1)  A county may not impose a tax on firearms, air guns,
 knives, ammunition, or firearm or air gun supplies, other than a tax
 authorized by state law.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *